Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Fulgentius Antonio Torres, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of New Norcia

Titular Bishop of DorylaŽum

Superior of Drisdale River

Apostolic Administrator of Kimberley in Western Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1861BornIbiza, Spain
5 Jun 188927.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Oct 190241.3SelectedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
11 Jan 190341.5InstalledAbbot of New Norcia, Australia
4 May 191048.9AppointedSuperior of Drisdale River, Australia
5 May 191048.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kimberley in Western Australia
10 May 191048.9AppointedTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum
22 May 191048.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum
5 Oct 191453.3DiedAbbot of New Norcia, Australia

MicroData Summary for Fulgentius Antonio Torres:
Abbot Fulgentius Antonio Torres O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of New Norcia

  • a priest for 25.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1910, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013