Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustin Nicolas Tijerino y Loáisiga

Deceased

Bishop of León en Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1881BornLeón
22 Apr 190523.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 192140.3AppointedBishop of León en Nicaragua
23 Apr 192240.7Ordained BishopBishop of León en Nicaragua
28 Mar 194563.7DiedBishop of León en Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Agustin Nicolas Tijerino y Loáisiga:
Bishop Agustin Nicolas Tijerino y Loáisiga (born , died ) Bishop of León en Nicaragua

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015