Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidro Augusto Oviedo y Reyes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

Titular Bishop of Polymartium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1905BornChinandega
25 Jul 193024.7Ordained PriestPriest of León en Nicaragua
11 Dec 193934.0AppointedBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
7 Apr 194034.4Ordained BishopBishop of Matagalpa, Nicaragua
13 Jun 194640.6AppointedBishop of León en Nicaragua
14 Apr 196963.4ResignedBishop of León en Nicaragua
14 Apr 196963.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Polymartium
31 Oct 196963.9DiedBishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Isidro Augusto Oviedo y Reyes:
Bishop Isidro Augusto Oviedo y Reyes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of León en Nicaragua

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013