Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Thibodeau, C.I.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Edmundston, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1939 BornSaint-Odilon
8 May 196525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
22 Oct 199354.2AppointedBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
9 Jan 199454.5Ordained BishopBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada
5 Jan 200969.4ResignedBishop of Edmundston, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for François Thibodeau:
Bishop François Thibodeau C.I.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Edmundston

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Edmundston.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013