Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Tavani

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1831Born
11 Mar 185422.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 186130.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
25 Jul 186130.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
25 Jul 186130.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
25 Jul 186130.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
25 Jul 186130.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
18 Jul 186938.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
18 Jul 186938.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
18 Jul 186938.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
18 Jul 186938.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Peru
18 Jul 186938.0ResignedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
21 Mar 187341.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
21 Mar 187341.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
23 Mar 187341.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
10 Mar 190573.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Tavani (VIAF: 89528774)
Bishop Francesco Tavani (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena (e Nonantola)
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 398
  • ab/1861: LB, 20 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017