Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Previtera (Privitera)

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1844Born
22 May 186924.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188843.5AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
11 Jun 188843.5Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
14 Feb 190358.2DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Previtera (Privitera) (VIAF: 89322885)
Bishop Giovanni Previtera (Privitera) (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinguaglossa, Diocese of Acireale
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 434
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 31
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 53, Number 3,799

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast