Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Tommasi

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1839Born
20 Sep 186223.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188849.1AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
11 Jun 188849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
11 Jul 189253.2AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
4 Sep 190869.4DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Tommasi (VIAF: 254421318)
Archbishop Benedetto Tommasi (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

EventPlace
Birth PlacePietrasanta, Archdiocese of Pisa
Ordained BishopS. Charles au Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 270
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,228
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017