Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jader Bertini

Deceased

Bishop of Montalcino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1839Born
21 Dec 186122.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 189960.1AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
19 Nov 189960.3Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
27 Sep 190869.2DiedBishop of Montalcino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Jader Bertini (VIAF: 88872388)
Bishop Jader Bertini (born , died ) Bishop of Montalcino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopSt. Francois, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 319
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017