Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wunibald (Godehard) Talleur, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Magydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1901Born
24 Apr 192725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Dec 194746.1AppointedPrelate of Chapada, Brazil
20 Dec 194746.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
7 Mar 194846.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
1970²68.2ResignedPrelate of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil
21 Mar 197573.4DiedPrelate Emeritus of Rondonópolis, Mato Grosso, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Wunibald (Godehard) Talleur
Bishop Wunibald (Godehard) Talleur O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Rondonópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHildesheim, Germany

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018