Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Máximo André Biennès, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1921Born
20 Jun 194725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
3 Nov 196746.2AppointedBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
25 Feb 196846.5Ordained BishopBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
24 Jul 199169.9ResignedBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
10 Aug 200786.0DiedBishop Emeritus of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Máximo André Biennès (VIAF: 64042572)
Bishop Máximo André Biennès T.O.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Luíz de Cáceres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbi, Archdiocese of Albi, France
Ordained BishopNotre Dame des Peres de la Dreche, Church, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 29 Jan 2019

Quantcast