Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Stasiuk, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1943 BornRoblin, Canada
28 Aug 196219.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
28 Aug 196522.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2 Jul 196723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
16 Dec 199249.4AppointedBishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia
9 Mar 199349.6Ordained BishopBishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian), Australia

MicroData Summary for Peter Stasiuk:
Bishop Peter Stasiuk C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saints Peter and Paul of Melbourne (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 12,007
  • prof/sole: CB, 6 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 7 Feb 2015