Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rumen Ivanov Stanev

Auxiliary Bishop of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria

Titular Bishop of Simidicca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1973 Born
11 Sep 199926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
5 Sep 202047.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sofia e Plovdiv, Bulgaria
5 Sep 202047.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
17 Jan 202147.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca

MicroData Summary for Rumen Ivanov Stanev
Bishop Rumen Ivanov Stanev (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sofia e Plovdiv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaloyanovo, Vicariate Apostolic of Sofia e Plovdiv
Ordained PriestCathedral, Plovdiv, Diocese of Sofia e Plovdiv
Ordained BishopSan Giuseppe, Co-Cathedral, Sofia, Diocese of Sofia e Plovdiv

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sofia e Plovdiv.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Sep 2020
  • ob: CB, 4 Nov 2020
  • c2+: CB, 5 Nov 2020
  • ~ob: CB, 17 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 17 Jan 2021

Quantcast