Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florian Stan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian)

Titular Bishop of Axiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1857BornJegariste
3 Oct 192265.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania
3 Oct 192265.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Axiopolis
19 Dec 192265.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Axiopolis
15 May 192467.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino} (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Florian Stan:
Bishop Florian Stan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino}

  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/d/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,747
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013