Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregory Singkai

Deceased

Bishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1935Born
17 Dec 196631.9Ordained PriestPriest of Northern Solomon Islands, Papua New Guinea
1 Jul 197439.5AppointedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
24 Nov 197439.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
12 Sep 199661.6DiedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Gregory Singkai
Bishop Gregory Singkai (born 1935, died ) Bishop of Bougainville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoromira

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018