Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Unabali

Deceased

Bishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1957Born
14 Dec 198528.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
1 Jun 200649.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
1 Jun 200649.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cuicul
6 Sep 200649.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cuicul
15 Dec 200952.6AppointedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
10 Aug 201962.2DiedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Bernard Unabali
Bishop Bernard Unabali (born , died ) Bishop of Bougainville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBolioko, Sovelle
Ordained BishopHahela, Buka, Diocese of Bougainville
Death PlaceSt. Luke’s Medical Center, Quezon City

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,233
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2009
  • d: CB, 10 Aug 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast