Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henk Kronenberg, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1934Born
18 Oct 196127.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
19 Apr 199964.5AppointedBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
14 Jul 199964.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
15 Dec 200975.2RetiredBishop of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea
25 Mar 202085.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bougainville, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Henk Kronenberg
Bishop Henk Kronenberg S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bougainville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEnschede, Netherlands
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Tsiroge
Death PlaceEnschede, Netherlands

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,587
  • d: CB, 26 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 27 Mar 2020

Quantcast