Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel da Silva Martins

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Setúbal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1927Born
12 Aug 195124.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 197548.4AppointedBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
26 Oct 197548.7Ordained BishopBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
23 Apr 199871.2ResignedBishop of Setúbal, Portugal
24 Sep 201790.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Setúbal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel da Silva Martins (VIAF: 9541419)
Bishop Manuel da Silva Martins (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Setúbal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeça do Balio
Death PlaceMaia, Diocese of Porto

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 24 Sep 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast