Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Baltasar Marcelino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aveiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1930BornLousa
9 Jun 195524.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 197544.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
15 Jul 197544.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Cercina
21 Sep 197545.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cercina
8 Sep 198352.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aveiro, Portugal
20 Jan 198857.3SucceededBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
21 Sep 200676.0RetiredBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
9 Oct 201383.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Aveiro, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Baltasar Marcelino:
Bishop António Baltasar Marcelino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aveiro

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 9 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015