Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Augustin Sibille] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Aube (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1724Born
21 Mar 179166.4SelectedBishop of [Aube (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179166.5Ordained BishopBishop of [Aube (Constitutional), France]
18 Nov 179369.1ResignedBishop of [Aube (Constitutional), France]
11 Feb 179873.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Aube (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Augustin Sibille (VIAF: 37027019)
Bishop Augustin Sibille (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aube

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroyes
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceTroyes

  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast