Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Pierre-Joseph Porion] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Pas-de-Calais (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1743Born
27 Mar 179147.3SelectedBishop of [Pas-de-Calais (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179147.4Ordained BishopBishop of [Pas-de-Calais (Constitutional), France]
1793²49.1ResignedBishop of [Pas-de-Calais (Constitutional), France]
20 Mar 183086.3DiedBishop Emeritus of [Pas-de-Calais (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Joseph Porion (VIAF: 34566919)
Bishop Pierre-Joseph Porion (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pas-de-Calais

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThièvres
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 13 Oct 2018

Quantcast