Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Antoine-Hubert Wandelaincourt] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Haute-Marne (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1731Born
29 Mar 179159.9SelectedBishop of [Haute-Marne (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179159.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Haute-Marne (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³70.4ResignedBishop of [Haute-Marne (Constitutional), France]
30 Dec 181988.6DiedBishop Emeritus of [Haute-Marne (Constitutional), France]

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Hubert Wandelaincourt (VIAF: 14778159)
Bishop Antoine-Hubert Wandelaincourt (born , died ) Bishop of Haute-Marne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRupt en Woevre
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceBelleville, sur Meuse

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast