Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Pierre Suzor] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of [Indre-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1733Born
16 Mar 179158.0SelectedBishop of [Indre-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179158.1Ordained BishopBishop of [Indre-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
22 Feb 179460.9ResignedBishop of [Indre-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
13 Apr 180168.1DiedBishop Emeritus of [Indre-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Pierre Suzor (VIAF: 29641886)
Bishop Pierre Suzor (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Indre-et-Loire

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreuilly
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlacePreuilly

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast