Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude-François-Marie Primat, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse

Note/Previous Titular See: (constitutionnel du Nord; du Rhône-et-Loire)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1747BornLyon
27 Feb 179143.6AppointedBishop
10 Apr 179143.7Ordained BishopBishop
10 Feb 179850.5AppointedBishop
1801¹53.4ResignedBishop
9 Apr 180254.7SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
29 Apr 180254.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
10 Oct 181669.2DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude-François-Marie Primat:
Archbishop Claude-François-Marie Primat C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

  • a bishop for 25.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013