Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victorius (Franciscus Xaverius) Schweizer, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

Titular Bishop of Gabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1737BornEhingen
21 Nov 176326.3ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
9 Nov 178750.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India
9 Nov 178750.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gabala
8 Feb 178951.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gabala
31 May 179355.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals), India

MicroData Summary for Victorius (Franciscus Xaverius) Schweizer
Bishop Victorius (Franciscus Xaverius) Schweizer O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Mogul (Mughals)

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 222, and Page 455
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016