Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alois Schwarz

Bishop of Gurk


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1952 BornHollenthon
29 Jun 197624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
27 Dec 199644.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
27 Dec 199644.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
22 Feb 199744.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
22 May 200148.9AppointedBishop of Gurk, Austria
23 Jun 200149.0InstalledBishop of Gurk, Austria

MicroData Summary for Alois Schwarz:
Bishop Alois Schwarz (born ) Bishop of Gurk

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gurk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,926

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013