Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simone Alfiero Scatizzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pistoia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1931Born
29 Jun 195423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Prato, Italy
1 Aug 197746.1AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
8 Sep 197746.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
27 May 198150.0AppointedBishop of Pistoia, Italy
4 Nov 200675.4RetiredBishop of Pistoia, Italy
27 Aug 201079.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pistoia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Simone Alfiero Scatizzi
Bishop Simone Alfiero Scatizzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pistoia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoiano, Diocese of Prato
Ordained PriestSan Stefano, Cathedral, Prato, Diocese of Prato
Ordained BishopSan Stefano, Cathedral, Prato, Diocese of Prato
Death PlaceHospital, Prato, Diocese of Prato

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2006
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,067

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 12 Jun 2020

Quantcast