Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gian Franco Saba

Archbishop of Sassari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1968 Born
13 Sep 199223.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tempio-Ampurias, Italy
23 Oct 199325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tempio-Ampurias, Italy
27 Jun 201748.7AppointedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
13 Sep 201748.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
1 Oct 201749.0InstalledArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Franco Saba (VIAF: 58481268)
Archbishop Gian Franco Saba (born ) Archbishop of Sassari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlbia, Diocese of Ampurias e Tempio
Ordained DeaconSan Simplicio, Basilica, Olbia, Diocese of Tempio-Ampurias
Ordained PriestSan Simplicio, Basilica, Olbia, Diocese of Tempio-Ampurias
Ordained BishopA. Caocci Stadio, Olbia, Diocese of Tempio-Ampurias

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sassari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2017
  • c2: CB, 27 Jun 2017
  • c34: CB, 11 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,579
  • od/c01/loc: AM, 2 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Nov 2018

Quantcast