Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Hermes Robledo Romero

Bishop of San Lorenzo, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1950--> Born
25 Dec 197525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Asunción, Paraguay
18 May 200049.6IncardinatedPriest of San Lorenzo, Paraguay
1 Jul 200958.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
30 Aug 200958.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
10 Jul 201059.7SucceededBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
4 Jul 201564.7AppointedBishop of San Lorenzo, Paraguay
13 Sep 201564.9InstalledBishop of San Lorenzo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Hermes Robledo Romero
(WikiData: Q1690895)
Bishop Joaquín Hermes Robledo Romero (born ) Bishop of San Lorenzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsunción

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Lorenzo.

  • a priest for --> years
  • a bishop for --> years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,266
  • s: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2015
  • i: CB, 13 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024