Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ricciulli

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
9 Jun 165944.4AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
15 Jun 165944.4Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
Aug 1660³45.5DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ricciulli
Bishop Antonio Ricciulli (born 1615, died Aug 1660) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRugliano, Archdiocese of Cosenza
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aracoeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 737
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 22
  • obp: AT, 12 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017