Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Persio Caracci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Larino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1594Born
8 Dec 163036.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 163136.4AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
1656²61.4ResignedBishop of Larino, Italy
27 Aug 167581.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Larino, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Persio Caracci
Bishop Persio Caracci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Larino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuastalla

  • a priest for 44.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 215
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017