Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Carlo Valentini

Deceased

Bishop of Città Ducale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹Born
9 Jun 165942.4AppointedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
15 Jun 165942.4Ordained BishopBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
Aug 1681³64.5DiedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Valentini
Bishop Giovanni Carlo Valentini (born 1617, died Aug 1681) Bishop of Città Ducale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRieti, Diocese of Rieti
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aracoeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 44
  • ob/c2+: AT, 12 Jan 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast