Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Montoja de Cardona

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Dec 1658SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
9 Jun 1659ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
15 Jun 1659Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
9 Mar 1667DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Montoja de Cardona:
Bishop Giovanni Montoja de Cardona (died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 737
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015