Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María de los Reyes Almada, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sonora, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1729Born
11 Dec 178051.2AppointedBishop of Sonora, México
15 Sep 178253.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sonora, México
6 Mar 178757.4DiedBishop of Sonora, México

MicroData Summary for Antonio María de los Reyes Almada
Bishop Antonio María de los Reyes Almada O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Sonora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAspe, Alicante, Spain

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,651
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 99, Number 510
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018