Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Rembanga

Bishop Emeritus of Bambari, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1955 Born
27 Jul 198630.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 199539.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
29 Oct 199540.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
29 Feb 199640.3SucceededBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic
6 Nov 200449.0ResignedBishop of Bambari, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Rembanga
Bishop Jean-Claude Rembanga (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bambari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIppy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bambari.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,628

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018