Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel Adolfo Polachini Rodriguez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guanare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1919BornAltagracia de Orituco
11 Jul 194324.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 196647.8AppointedPrelate of San Fernando de Apure, Venezuela
30 Nov 196647.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
30 Apr 196748.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusticiana
25 Mar 197152.1AppointedBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
16 Apr 199475.2RetiredBishop of Guanare, Venezuela
10 Jan 200484.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Guanare, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Angel Adolfo Polachini Rodriguez:
Bishop Angel Adolfo Polachini Rodriguez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guanare

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015