Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mosé João Pontelo, C.S.Sp.

Bishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1942 Born
14 May 196724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
27 May 199855.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
2 Aug 199855.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
3 Jan 200158.2SucceededBishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil
19 Sep 201876.0RetiredBishop of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mosé João Pontelo
Bishop Mosé João Pontelo C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cruzeiro do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWenceslau Braz
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora dos Remédios, Church, Vila dos Remédios, Osasco, Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul, Acre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cruzeiro do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,364
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 19 Sep 2018

Quantcast