Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustus Peters

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1931Born
1 Mar 195826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Aachen, Germany
6 Apr 198149.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany
6 Apr 198149.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
9 May 198149.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Sirenses
3 May 198654.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Augustus Peters
Bishop Augustus Peters (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAachen, Diocese of Aachen

  • a priest for 28.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018