Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Persico

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹Born
3 Aug 160550.5AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
14 Aug 160550.6Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
1615²60.0DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Persico
Bishop Francesco Persico (born 1555, died 1615) Bishop of Montepeloso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleti
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 247
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 9
  • ob: AT, 12 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017