Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nuno Álvares Pereira de Melo

Deceased

Bishop of Lamego


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1662²BornLisboa
7 May 171048.3AppointedBishop of Lamego, Portugal
19 Oct 171048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lamego, Portugal
8 May 173371.3DiedBishop of Lamego, Portugal

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nuno Álvares Pereira de Melo:
Bishop Nuno Álvares Pereira de Melo (born 1662, died ) Bishop of Lamego

  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,462
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,016
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015