Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Paiaro

Bishop Emeritus of Nyahururu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1934 BornVoltabarozza, Italy
12 Jul 195924.8Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
4 Jan 200368.3AppointedBishop of Nyahururu, Kenya
25 Mar 200368.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nyahururu, Kenya
24 Dec 201177.3RetiredBishop of Nyahururu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Luigi Paiaro:
Bishop Luigi Paiaro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nyahururu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nyahururu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,355

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013