Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz-Josef Overbeck

Bishop of Essen

Bishop of Germany, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1964 BornMarl
10 Oct 198925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
18 Jul 200743.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
18 Jul 200743.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
1 Sep 200743.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
28 Oct 200945.4AppointedBishop of Essen, Germany
20 Dec 200945.5InstalledBishop of Essen, Germany
24 Feb 201146.7AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
6 May 201146.9InstalledBishop of Germany, Military

MicroData Summary for Franz-Josef Overbeck:
Bishop Franz-Josef Overbeck (born ) Bishop of Essen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Essen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2007
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,497
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013