Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Núñez de la Vega, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹Born
22 Apr 168248.3SelectedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
8 Jun 168248.4ConfirmedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
18 Jan 168450.0InstalledBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México
1706¹72.0DiedBishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas), México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Núñez de la Vega
Bishop Francisco Núñez de la Vega O.P. (born 1634, died 1706) Bishop of Chiapas (Ciudad Real de Chiapas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuevo Reino de Granada

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,852
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1684
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast