Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Antonio Nova Rocha

Deceased

Bishop of Facatativá, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1943Born
22 Aug 196825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Facatativá, Colombia
15 Feb 200258.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
15 Feb 200258.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Equizetum
9 Mar 200258.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Equizetum
13 Nov 201067.2AppointedBishop of Facatativá, Colombia
22 Jan 201167.4InstalledBishop of Facatativá, Colombia
9 Apr 201369.6DiedBishop of Facatativá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio Nova Rocha
Bishop Luis Antonio Nova Rocha (born , died ) Bishop of Facatativá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSubachoque

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,145
  • d: CB, 10 Apr 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast