Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidio Miragoli

Bishop of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1955 Born
23 Jun 197923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lodi, Italy
29 Sep 201762.1AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
11 Nov 201762.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mondovi, Italy
8 Dec 201762.3InstalledBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio Miragoli (VIAF: 107609662)
Bishop Egidio Miragoli (born ) Bishop of Mondovi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGradella di Pandino, Diocese of Lodi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lodi, Diocese of Lodi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mondovi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2017
  • ob: CB, 7 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 12 Nov 2017