Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Mendoza y Bedolla

Deceased

Bishop of Campeche


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1881BornSan Salvador El Seco
28 Oct 191029.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 193957.9AppointedBishop of Campeche, México
28 Oct 193958.2Ordained BishopBishop of Campeche, México
26 Nov 193958.3InstalledBishop of Campeche, México
28 Feb 196785.6DiedBishop of Campeche, México

MicroData Summary for Alberto Mendoza y Bedolla:
Bishop Alberto Mendoza y Bedolla (born , died ) Bishop of Campeche

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 16 Jan 2014