Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominicus (Michael) Meier, O.S.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Castro di Sardegna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1959 Born
9 Sep 198324.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Jan 198929.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Jul 201556.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
15 Jul 201556.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Castro di Sardegna
27 Sep 201556.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castro di Sardegna

MicroData Summary for Dominicus (Michael) Meier
Bishop Dominicus (Michael) Meier O.S.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFinnentrop-Heggen

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Paderborn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2015
  • ob/c12/prof/bp: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • c34: CB, 23 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast