Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tesfasellassie Medhin

Bishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1953 Born
4 Apr 198027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
16 Nov 200148.8AppointedBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia
20 Jan 200249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Adigrat (Ethiopian), Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Tesfasellassie Medhin
Bishop Tesfasellassie Medhin (born ) Bishop of Adigrat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlitena

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Adigrat (Ethiopian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jul 2017