Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gerard McClean

Deceased

Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1914Born
22 Mar 194227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
10 Dec 196652.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
10 Dec 196652.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
24 Feb 196752.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita
12 Jun 196752.7SucceededBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
27 Aug 197863.9DiedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Gerard McClean
Bishop John Gerard McClean (born , died ) Bishop of Middlesbrough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRedcar, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Ordained PriestSt. Cuthbert, Seminary, Ushaw, Durham, County Durham, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Succour, Cathedral, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Death PlaceBlackley, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph, Cemetery, North Ormesby, Middlesbrough, North Yorkshire, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Mary, Cathedral, Coulby Newham, Middlesbrough, Cleveland, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 140
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast