Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aurelio Marena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1893Born
25 Aug 191724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
25 Aug 194653.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
25 Aug 194653.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
27 Oct 194653.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lampsacus
16 Mar 195056.5AppointedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
21 Nov 197885.2RetiredBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
24 Mar 198389.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aurelio Marena
Bishop Aurelio Marena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ruvo e Bitonto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 65.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018