Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe De Nicola

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Archbishop of Rhoina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1876BornNapoli
27 May 189923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
3 Oct 194165.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
3 Oct 194165.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
26 Oct 194165.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
6 Sep 195579.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhoina
16 May 195882.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe De Nicola:
Archbishop Giuseppe De Nicola (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013